+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 9, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0550 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15020, Expires on Feb 27, 2017
On December 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On November 30, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 29, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0550, Expires on Feb 27, 2017
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0550, Expires on Feb 27, 2017
On November 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 5, 2016
On November 15, 2016 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- B21-0942 Introduced by Councilmembers McDuffie and Alexander at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 15, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor