+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0475 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14604, Expires on Jan 30, 2021
On November 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 2, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0475, Expires on Jan 30, 2021
On October 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 03, 2020
On October 6, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On September 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On September 21, 2020 in the Council:
- B23-0904 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson, and Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
September 22, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor