+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 4, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0525 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13605, Expires on Jan 28, 2017
On October 31, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0525, Expires on Jan 28, 2017
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0525, Expires on Jan 28, 2017
- Returned from Mayor
On October 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On October 17, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 31, 2016
On October 11, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On October 7, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0903 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
October 11, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor