+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On September 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On August 3, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0428 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7992, Expires on Oct 23, 2018
On July 26, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 25, 2018 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0428, Expires on Oct 23, 2018
- Signed with Act Number A22-0428, Expires on Oct 23, 2018
On July 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 30, 2018
On July 10, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-0899 Introduced by Councilmember Grosso at Office of the Secretary
- Final Reading
+ − Vote
July 10, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor