+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 29, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0389 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7013, Expires on Sep 20, 2018
On June 25, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 22, 2018 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0389, Expires on Sep 20, 2018
- Signed with Act Number A22-0389, Expires on Sep 20, 2018
On June 14, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 28, 2018
On June 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On June 5, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-0837 Introduced by Councilmembers Allen Evans, and Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
- Final Reading
+ − Vote
June 5, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13