+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 27, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0350 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6326, Expires on Sep 14, 2014
On June 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0350, Expires on Sep 14, 2014
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0350, Expires on Sep 14, 2014
- Retained by the Council
On June 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 24, 2014
On June 3, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading, CC
- B20-0812 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 3, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor