+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 21, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0373 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9847, Expires on Nov 09, 2020
On August 14, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On August 12, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0373, Expires on Nov 09, 2020
On July 30, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 13, 2020
On July 21, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On July 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On June 30, 2020 in the Council:
- B23-0806 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 21, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor