+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0427 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9022, Expires on Sep 21, 2016
On June 24, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 23, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0427, Expires on Sep 21, 2016
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0427, Expires on Sep 21, 2016
On June 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On June 10, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 24, 2016
On June 7, 2016 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- B21-0782 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 7, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor