+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 25, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0542 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14368
On November 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0542
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0542
On November 4, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 21, 2016
On November 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On October 11, 2016 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On October 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0763
On September 28, 2016 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0763
On August 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 10, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0763 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 7, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
On May 26, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0763 Introduced by Councilmember Evans at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
November 1, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
October 11, 2016: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor