+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On August 10, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0136 Effective from Jul 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8179, Expires on Feb
On June 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On May 25, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0355 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5771
On May 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 15, 2018 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0355
- Signed with Act Number A22-0355
On May 7, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018
On May 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On April 10, 2018 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
- First Reading
On March 27, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-0763 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
April 10, 2018: First Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor