+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0079 Effective from Feb 22, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3469
On January 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0249 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 153
On January 9, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Feb 22, 2014
On December 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 27, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0249
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0249
On December 16, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 31, 2013
On December 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment (Wells)
- Amendment (McDuffie #1 and #2)
On November 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Amendment (McDuffie) - accepted as friendly
- Amendment (Wells # 1)
- Amendment (Wells # 2)
- Amendment (Wells # 3) - not considered
- 1st Reading
On October 31, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0076
On March 28, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0076 View Video :
On March 7, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0076 View Video :
On February 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0076 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- B20-0076 Introduced by Councilmembers Bowser, Grosso, Wells, and McDuffie at Committee of the Whole
+ − Votes (8)
December 3, 2013: Amendment (McDuffie #1 and #2)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
December 3, 2013: Amendment (Wells)
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 12
December 3, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
November 5, 2013: Amendment (Wells # 3) - not considered
- Yeas: 13
November 5, 2013: Amendment (McDuffie) - accepted as friendly
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
November 5, 2013: 1st Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
November 5, 2013: Amendment (Wells # 1)
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 2
November 5, 2013: Amendment (Wells # 2)
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 2