+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 23, 2020 in the Council:
- Law L23-0130, Effective from Oct 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12236, Expires on May 21, 2021
On July 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0334 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8622
On July 16, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On July 8, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0334
On June 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 07, 2020
On June 9, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council
On May 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0758 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 19, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On May 18, 2020 in the Council:
- B23-0758 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson, Councilmembers Grosso, R. White, Cheh, Allen, T. White, McDuffie, Bonds, Silverman, Nadeau, Gray, and Todd at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2020: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
June 9, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
May 19, 2020: First Reading
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor