+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 12, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0326 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7045, Expires on Jun 09, 2020
On June 9, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On May 29, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 27, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0326, Expires on Jun 09, 2020
On May 26, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 09, 2020
On May 19, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On May 18, 2020 in the Council:
- B23-0757 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson, Councilmembers Grosso, R. White, Cheh, Allen, T. White, McDuffie, Bonds, Silverman, Nadeau, Todd, and Gray at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2020: Oral Amendment (Nadeau and Allen)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: No
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: No
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
May 19, 2020: Oral Amendments (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
May 19, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor