+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On February 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A22-0610 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 1606
On January 31, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On January 30, 2019 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0610
- Signed with Act Number A22-0610
On January 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 30, 2019
On December 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Amendment (Mendelson)
- Final Reading
On November 13, 2018 in the Council:
- Amendment (Mendelson)
- First Reading
On October 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Postponed to 11/13/18 Legislative Meeting
On October 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0075
- Postponed to 10/16/18 Legislative Meeting
On April 24, 2017 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0075
On March 31, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 27, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0075 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 24, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0075 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, Nadeau, Gray, Allen, R. White, Silverman, and McDuffie
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
+ − Votes (6)
December 4, 2018: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
December 4, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 13, 2018: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 13
November 13, 2018: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
October 16, 2018: Postponed to 11/13/18 Legislative Meeting
- Yeas: 13
October 2, 2018: Postponed to 10/16/18 Legislative Meeting
- Yeas: 13