+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 5, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0131 Effective from Aug 8, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 9138, Expires on Mar 21, 2015
On June 27, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0354 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6336
On June 26, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Aug 8, 2014
On June 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0354
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0354
On June 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 24, 2014
On June 3, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading, CC
On May 6, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading
On April 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On April 1, 2014 in the Council:
- B20-0745 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
May 6, 2014: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor