+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 9, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0558 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15043
On December 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0558
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0558
- Returned from Mayor
On November 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 6, 2016
On November 15, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On November 3, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 1, 2016 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0742
On October 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 25, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0742
On October 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0742
On September 30, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 23, 2016 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published
On September 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to the Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs
On May 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0742 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 3, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs and Committee of the Whole
- B21-0742 Introduced by Councilmembers Orange, Evans, and Nadeau at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
November 15, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
November 1, 2016: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1