+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On October 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0074
On September 26, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 19, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 5, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0074 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Economic Development
- B20-0074 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Committee of the Whole