+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 5, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0488 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12425
On November 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0488
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0488
On November 12, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 26, 2014
On October 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On October 7, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading, CC
On July 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On July 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0725
On June 19, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0725 View Video :
On April 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 21, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0725 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- B20-0725 Introduced by Councilmember Catania at Committee of the Whole
+ − Votes (2)
October 28, 2014: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
October 7, 2014: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1