+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0285 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3965, Expires on Jun 29, 2020
On April 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On April 2, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On March 31, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0285, Expires on Jun 29, 2020
On March 20, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Apr 03, 2020
On March 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- B23-0720 Introduced by Councilmember Nadeau at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 17, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor