+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 27, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0403 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 7925, Expires on Aug 19, 2016
On May 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0403, Expires on Aug 19, 2016
On May 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 20, 2016
On May 3, 2016 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- Retained by the Council
On April 28, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0718 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
May 3, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor