+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 2, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0144 Effective from Aug 19, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 11135
On July 8, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Aug 19, 2016
- Act A21-0429 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9275
On June 29, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 27, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0429
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0429
On June 24, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 11, 2016
On June 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment (Mendelson) - Accepted as a friendly
On June 7, 2016 in the Council:
- Amendment (Orange)
- Amendment (Allen) - Accepted as a friendly
- Amendment (Grosso) - Accepted as a friendly
- First Reading
On June 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0712
On May 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0712
On May 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 3, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
On April 29, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0712 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 19, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0712 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (6)
June 21, 2016: Amendment (Mendelson) - Accepted as a friendly
- Yeas: 13
June 21, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
June 7, 2016: Amendment (Orange)
- Yeas: 13
June 7, 2016: Amendment (Grosso) - Accepted as a friendly
- Yeas: 13
June 7, 2016: Amendment (Allen) - Accepted as a friendly
- Yeas: 13
June 7, 2016: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor