+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 11, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0116 Effective from Jun 21, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6926, Expires on Feb 1, 2015
On May 9, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 21, 2014
- Act A20-0321 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 4677
On April 29, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On April 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0321
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0321
On April 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading, CC
On March 4, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading
- Retained by the Council
- B20-0705 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
March 4, 2014: First Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor