+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 15, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0290 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5023, Expires on Jul 30, 2020
On May 5, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 1, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0290, Expires on Jul 30, 2020
On April 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 01, 2020
On April 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On March 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Facilities and Procurement
On March 3, 2020 in the Council:
- B23-0704 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 7, 2020: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor