+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0302 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3472, Expires on Jun 18, 2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On March 20, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0302, Expires on Jun 18, 2014
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0302, Expires on Jun 18, 2014
On March 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 24, 2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- Retained by the Council
- B20-0698 Introduced by Councilmembers Evans and Wells at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 4, 2014: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor