+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 13, 2019 in the Council:
- Law Number L22-0238 Effective from Mar 13, 2019
On January 29, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On January 18, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A22-0561 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 594
On January 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0561
- Signed with Act Number A22-0561
On December 28, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 15, 2019
On December 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On November 13, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On October 19, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0690
On June 22, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0690
On June 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 9, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0690 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 6, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-0690 Introduced by Councilmembers Gray, Todd, R. White, Grosso, Evans, McDuffie, Allen, Nadeau,
- Referred to Committee on Health
+ − Votes (2)
December 4, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
November 13, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (10)
Vincent Gray
Type:
Primary Sponsor