+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On August 19, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0127 Effective from Jul 1, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10572, Expires on Feb 11, 2017
On May 19, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On May 13, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0380 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 7102
On May 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 4, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0380
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0380
On April 22, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 6, 2016
On April 19, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On April 5, 2016 in the Council:
- First Reading
- Retained by the Council
On April 4, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0680 Introduced by Councilmember Grosso at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
April 5, 2016: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor