+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0266 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2119, Expires on May 21, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0266, Expires on May 21, 2018
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0266, Expires on May 21, 2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On February 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 27, 2018
On February 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On February 5, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-0680 Introduced by Councilmember Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 6, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor