+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 6, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0365 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 6838, Expires on Jul 24, 2016
On April 28, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On April 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0365, Expires on Jul 24, 2016
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0365, Expires on Jul 24, 2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Apr 27, 2016
On April 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
- Retained by the Council
On April 4, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0676 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
April 5, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor