+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0348 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002618, Expires on Jun 26, 2022
On March 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0348, Expires on Jun 26, 2022
On March 14, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 28, 2022
On March 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Housing and Executive Administration
On February 17, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0670 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 1, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor