+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0160 Effective from Oct 8, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 12932
On August 31, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On August 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0488 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10775
On August 24, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Oct 8, 2016
On August 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0488
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0488
On August 16, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On August 8, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 22, 2016
On June 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Amendments #1 thru 6 (Mendelson)
- Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
- Amendment (Silverman)
- Final Reading
On June 20, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On May 17, 2016 in the Council:
- Reconsidered
- First Reading
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
On May 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
On May 4, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0669
On April 29, 2016 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0669
On April 22, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On April 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0669 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 24, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0669 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (6)
June 21, 2016: Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute
June 21, 2016: Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 13
June 21, 2016: Amendment (Silverman)
- Yeas: 13
June 21, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
May 17, 2016: First Reading
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
May 17, 2016: Reconsidered
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor