+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Law Number L22-0209 Effective from Feb 22, 2019
On January 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On November 9, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0508 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12371
On November 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 31, 2018 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0508
- Signed with Act Number A22-0508
On October 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 6, 2018
On October 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On October 2, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On September 26, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On September 25, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0653
On June 27, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0653
On June 15, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 8, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0653 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 9, 2018 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On January 4, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-0653 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
October 16, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
October 2, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor