+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0259 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2105, Expires on May 22, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0259, Expires on May 22, 2018
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0259, Expires on May 22, 2018
On February 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 27, 2018
On February 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On January 9, 2018 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On December 21, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0643 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 6, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor