+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 29, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 13, 2021
On December 1, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 9, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0641
On September 25, 2020 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0641 View Public Hearing Record
On August 28, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On August 19, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On April 6, 2020 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0641
On April 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 21, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0641 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 4, 2020 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- B23-0641 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh, and Allen at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
December 1, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
November 17, 2020: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor