+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Law Number L22-0200 Effective from Feb 22, 2019
On January 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On November 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0492 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12066
On October 26, 2018 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0492
On October 24, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On October 11, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Oct 25, 2018
On October 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Bonds)
- Final Reading
On July 10, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On July 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0640
- Committee Report Filed
On June 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0640
On May 25, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0640
On May 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 22, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0640 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 19, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0640 Introduced by Councilmembers Bonds, Nadeau, Silverman, and McDuffie at Committee of the
- Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
+ − Votes (3)
October 2, 2018: Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Bonds)
- Yeas: 13
October 2, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
July 10, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13