+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 11, 2013 in the Council:
- Law L20-0016 Effective from Sep 19, 2013, Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 14500
On July 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Sep 19, 2013
On July 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0093 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 9837
On June 25, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 24, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0093
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0093
On June 13, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 27, 2013
On June 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Committee Report Filed
On May 7, 2013 in the Council:
- 1st Reading
On April 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0064
On April 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0064
On March 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0064 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
- B20-0064 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson and Councilmembers McDuffie and Barry at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
May 7, 2013: 1st Reading
- Yeas: 13