+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On July 2, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0063
On June 13, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 6, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0063 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- B20-0063 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson and Councilmembers Bowser and Cheh at Legislative Meeting