+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0349 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 4628, Expires on Jun 21, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0349, Expires on Jun 21, 2016
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0349, Expires on Jun 21, 2016
- Returned from Mayor
On March 9, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 23, 2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Retained by the Council
On February 29, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0627 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 1, 2016: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor