+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 10, 2015 in the Council:
- Act A21-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 62 and Page 4515, Expires on Jun 28, 2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On March 30, 2015 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0021, Expires on Jun 28, 2015
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0021, Expires on Jun 28, 2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 31, 2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
On February 3, 2015 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On January 29, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0062 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 3, 2015: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor