+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 29, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 12, 2019
On January 18, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A22-0559 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 590
On January 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0559
- Signed with Act Number A22-0559
On December 28, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 15, 2019
On December 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On November 13, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On November 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 1, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0618
On July 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0618
On June 15, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 8, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0618 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 5, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0618 Introduced by Councilmembers Silverman, Gray, T. White, Nadeau, and Bonds at Legislative
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
+ − Votes (2)
December 4, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
November 13, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor