+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 25, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0540 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14361
On November 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0540
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0540
On November 4, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 21, 2016
On November 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On October 11, 2016 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On September 21, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0602
On March 23, 2016 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0602
On March 4, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0602 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 2, 2016 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- B21-0602 Introduced by Councilmembers Alexander, Allen, Grosso, Cheh, and Silverman at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
November 1, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
October 11, 2016: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13