+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 2758, Expires on Apr 25, 2013
On January 29, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On January 25, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0001, Expires on Apr 25, 2013
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0001, Expires on Apr 25, 2013
On January 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 5, 2013
- Retained by the Council
On January 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
On January 7, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0006 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
January 8, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor