+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 22, 2022 in the Council:
- Law L24-0113, Effective from Apr 09, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 003716, Expires on Nov 20, 2022
On February 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On February 25, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0337 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001473
On February 22, 2022 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 17, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0337
On February 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 22, 2022
On February 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On January 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0593 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council
On January 3, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0593 Introduced by Councilmembers McDuffie, and Pinto at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
January 4, 2022: First Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Absent
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor