+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0287 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000447, Expires on Apr 12, 2022
On January 12, 2022 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0287, Expires on Apr 12, 2022
On January 11, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 26, 2022
On January 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council
On January 3, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0592 Introduced by Councilmembers McDuffie, and Pinto at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
January 4, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Absent
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor