+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0299 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 2135, Expires on May 18, 2016
On February 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0299, Expires on May 18, 2016
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0299, Expires on May 18, 2016
- Returned from Mayor
On February 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 22, 2016
On February 2, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On January 5, 2016 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On January 4, 2016 in the Council:
- B21-0572 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 2, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor