+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0077 Effective from Feb 22, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3467, Expires on Oct 5, 2014
On January 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0247 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 140
On January 9, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Feb 22, 2014
On December 30, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 27, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0247
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0247
On December 16, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 31, 2013
On December 3, 2013 in the Council:
- Final Reading, CC
On November 19, 2013 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On November 5, 2013 in the Council:
- First Reading
- B20-0562 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 3, 2013: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 5, 2013: First Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor