+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 19, 2013 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On November 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0210 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15781, Expires on Feb 5, 2014
On November 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 7, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0210, Expires on Feb 5, 2014
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0210, Expires on Feb 5, 2014
On November 6, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 21, 2013
On November 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
- B20-0560 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 5, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor