+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0553 View Public Hearing Record
On September 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On December 10, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0553 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On December 2, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0553 Introduced by Councilmembers R. White, Henderson, Lewis George, McDuffie, Bonds, Allen, Nadeau, Silverman, Gray, Pinto, Cheh, T. White, and Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsors (10)
R. White
Type:
Primary Sponsor