+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 6, 2020 in the Council:
- Law L23-0055, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2474, Expires on Oct 03, 2020
On January 8, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On January 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0189 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 36
On December 27, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 23, 2019 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0189
On December 12, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 27, 2019
On December 3, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council
On November 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0552 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- B23-0552 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, and Gray at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 3, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
November 19, 2019: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor