+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 8, 2017 in the Council:
- Act A22-0195 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12407, Expires on Feb 27, 2018
On November 30, 2017 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 29, 2017 in the Council:
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0195, Expires on Feb 27, 2018
- Signed with Act Number A22-0195, Expires on Feb 27, 2018
On November 15, 2017 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 30, 2017
On November 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
- Final Reading
On November 2, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0544 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson and Councilmember Nadeau at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 7, 2017: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor