+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Law L22-0165 Effective from Oct 30, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13691
On September 17, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On September 14, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0439 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9366
On September 5, 2018 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0439
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0439
On August 21, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Sep 5, 2018
On July 10, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On June 26, 2018 in the Council:
- Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie)
- First Reading
On June 6, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On June 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0537
On February 7, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0537
On January 12, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On November 3, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0537 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 25, 2017 in the Council:
- B22-0537 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (3)
July 10, 2018: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
June 26, 2018: Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie)
- Yeas: 13
June 26, 2018: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor